Ok so most people know the eleven times table up to 11 x 11, maybe even a couple more.

What about if you need to do 11 x a higher number, here is a quick trick:

11 x 18 - the first digit is 1 (from 18), the last digit is 8 (from 18), the middle digit is 1 + 8 (from 18) = 9, the result is 198

Here are some more:

11 x 24 = 2(6)4 = 264

11 x 27 = 2(9)7 = 297

11 x 35 = 3(8)5 = 385

If the middle number gets into double digits, simply carry the tens:

11 x 39 = 3(12)9 = 429

11 x 56 = 5(11)6 = 616

11 x 156 = 1(6)(11)6 = 1716

A nice easy way to multiply by 11